Case Information: 40802 | |||
Short Caption: | MACK (LEROY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 39756 , 41132 , 41777 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C127626 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/31/2003 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/16/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/16/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 03-00892 | |
01/22/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record due: 120 days. The record must include any previously prepared transcripts; the record shall not include exhibits. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn2[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] The record shall include transcripts of the proceedings conducted below on November 18, 2002, and January 9, 2003. The clerk of the district court shall transmit certified copies of the transcripts to the clerk of this court as a part of the record on appeal. | 03-01179 | |
02/06/2003 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 11/18/02 and 01/09/03. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. | 03-02155 | |
02/24/2003 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Proper Person Motion to Set Aside Judgment filed in district court on2/13/03. | 03-03094 | |
03/31/2003 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 03-05337 | |
03/31/2003 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/05/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. Order of Affirmance and Dismissing Appeal in Part. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED and DISMISS this appeal in part." NNP04S-NB/MS/MG | 03-18480 | |
12/02/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-18631 | |
12/02/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/22/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 5, 2003. | 03-18631 |