judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EDDIE O. KELSEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0346
Short Caption:EDDIE O. KELSEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8862-85Filed Date:02/06/1987

Opening Event Date:02/06/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/21/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/24/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/05/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/02/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEddie O. Kelsey N
Bernard Jay Williams YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kevin A. Forder YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KELSEY, EDDIE O. UNITED STATES
02/06/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/21/1987FiledRecord Completed
04/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BERNARD JAY WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DS TO JUNE 5TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD DSA
06/03/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1987ORDER GRT MO CLK IS DIR TO FILE THE LDGD DSA. FO APLT SHALL FILE SRT IN 10 DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 060287 SCHPRD OPE
09/30/1987RECEIVED STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE OR- DER 6/16/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 062687 SCHPRD STATE
10/19/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (21 PGS RT-HAWKINS) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 120287 SCHPRD BA
12/15/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/25/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 122387 SCHPRD BE
01/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/24/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 012588 SCHPRD BE
01/21/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (14 PGS - RAMOS) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/24/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 012188 SCHPRD N
02/24/1988FiledBriefing Completed
02/24/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF & APPENDIX PB PANEL SCDATE 022488 SCHPRD BE
07/05/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/05/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF ORDER ON APPEAL PANELMKTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/02/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD