judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HARRIS, BRISCOE A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1717
Short Caption:HARRIS, BRISCOE A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M1367-86Filed Date:12/17/1986

Opening Event Date:12/17/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/07/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/17/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/07/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/01/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
K. Duff Lewis NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Irwin A. Goldberg YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Thomas C. Black YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARRIS, BRISCOE A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/14/87 ORD: GRANT MO FOR LV NOTE - 01 TO W/D COUNSEL K. DUFF LEWIS NOTE - 02 & APPT IRWIN GOLDBERG TO NOTE - 02 REPRESENT APLT ON THIS APPEAL; NOTE - 03 NEWLY APPTD COUNSEL TO FL A NOTE - 03 STATEMENT INDICATING WHETHER NOTE - 04 TRANSCRIPT WILL BE ORDERED & NOTE - 04 PREPARED FOR THIS APPEAL.
01/01/1906 LEWISK WITHDRAWN 4/14/87.
12/17/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) K. DUFF LEWIS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 021687 SCHPRD R
03/26/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF K. DUFF LEWIS AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) IRWIN GOLDBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 040287 SCHPRD RBH
04/22/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (20 PGS - BURNS) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: FAILURE TO COM- PLY W/APR. 14, 1987 ORDER. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 050487 SCHPRD STATE
05/20/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/20/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO MAY 14TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD STATE
06/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1987ORDER CLK IS DIR TO FILE THE LDGD DSA; APLT'S BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 050787 SCHPRD CHECK
06/22/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD BA
08/10/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR, APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD OPE
08/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #73 (73 PGS. - FINNERIN) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (32 PGS - BURNS) GT PANEL SCDATE 091087 SCHPRD RT
11/07/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/07/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4( 258 PGS/SCHERTZER) AD PANEL SCDATE 042788 SCHPRD RT
12/13/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS TO JANUARY 18TH JB PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BA
01/09/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 1/18/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 010489 SCHPRD V
01/27/1989ORDER BA TO BE FILED BY 2/13/89 OR SHOW CAUSE BY APTMT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED AND NAME REMVD FVH PANELMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD BA
02/01/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS.DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD N
03/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-20-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 032389 SCHPRD BE
03/23/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 4/20/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 032789 SCHPRD CHECK
04/19/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-18-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 042089 SCHPRD BE
04/26/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/18/89;NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD CHECK
05/17/1989FiledBriefing Completed
05/17/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 051889 SCHPRD BE
11/07/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/07/1989SUBMITTED RJG PANELFETERY SCDATE 110789 SCHPRD CSUM
11/09/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELFETERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE RJG
12/01/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD