judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LOCKS, ANTHONY UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1472
Short Caption:LOCKS, ANTHONY UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M457-86Filed Date:09/16/1986

Opening Event Date:09/16/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/01/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/05/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/07/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/19/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Lenore M. Fitzgerald NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
David C. Gray YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John M. Seabright YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LOCKS, ANTHONY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/29/87 ORD:GRANT MO OF LENORE NOTE - 01 FITZGERALD TO W/D & APPTD NOTE - 02 DAVID C. GRAY TO REPRESENT NOTE - 02 APLT; NEW COUNSEL TO FL STATE NOTE - 03 IN 20 DAYS INDICATING WHETHER NOTE - 03 RT WILL BE ORDERED & PREPARED NOTE - 04 FOR APPEAL. NOTE - 04
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/12/07 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GRAYD FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SEABRIGHTJ FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 FITZGERALDL VACATED 9/29/87.
09/16/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/10/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB (NO SLIP SENT - ATTY APPT?) PANEL SCDATE 111786 SCHPRD R
02/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LENORE FITZGERALD, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 040687 SCHPRD BA
09/18/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF LENORE M. FITZGERALD AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID C. GRAY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD CHECK
10/01/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/01/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (77 PGS - TOOBY) JB PANEL SCDATE 070187 SCHPRD RT
10/09/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO SEPTEMBER 29TH ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD STATE
11/24/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 102987 SCHPRD CHECK
01/04/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 010488 SCHPRD BA
02/04/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 9, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD BE
03/08/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION JOINT MO FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE & EXTENSION ON DUE DATES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988ORDER GRANT JOINT MO FOR SUPP BRFNG; SUPP BRF OF APLT DUE BY 4/7/88 AND BRF OF APLE 30 DAYS AFTER. PANELPY SCDATE 031088 SCHPRD X
04/05/1988APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM MLH PANEL SCDATE 040788 SCHPRD SMA
05/05/1988FiledBriefing Completed
05/05/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF (NO BRIEF -- ADS ONLY) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1988APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM GT PANEL SCDATE 050588 SCHPRD SME
12/07/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/07/1988ARGUED PANELNWBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENTS OF CONVICTION PANELNWBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/19/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD