judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREEN, RODNEY UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1724
Short Caption:GREEN, RODNEY UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Unlawful Entry
Lead: 86-CM-1714 Consolidated:86-CM-1724
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M7784-86Filed Date:12/19/1986

Opening Event Date:12/19/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/18/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/26/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/26/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/11/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
David C. Gray YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Ellen Bass YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GREEN, RODNEY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 082887 ORDER: SS, CONS 86-1714 NOTE - 01 & 86-1724, GRANT MO FOR EXT TO NOTE - 02 FILE BRS, BRS OF APLT DUE 40 NOTE - 02 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED; FO: NOTE - 03 COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DAYS TO NOTE - 03 FILE STATES RE: STATUS OF RT. NOTE - 04 CON 86-1714 NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 10/22/87 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 05 JOHN T.RILEY TO W/D IN 86-1714 NOTE - 06 & APPT DAVID C. GRAY TO RPRSNT NOTE - 06 APLT IN 86-1714; BRF OF APLTS NOTE - 07 DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 07
12/19/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/27/1987RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 021787 SCHPRD R
03/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID C. GRAY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1987FiledRecord Completed
03/25/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 032787 SCHPRD DSA
08/28/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELBE SCDATE 050787 SCHPRD RT
08/31/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (9 PGS - SMITH) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/17/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 091787 SCHPRD STATE
10/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (101 PGS. FINNERIN) PANEL SCDATE 093087 SCHPRD RT
10/09/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF JOHN T. RIELY AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT IN 86-1714 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987ORDER SEE NOT FIELDS 05-07. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 101487 SCHPRD CHECK
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (5 PGS - OLIVER) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 120287 SCHPRD BA
12/04/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 29, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 010488 SCHPRD BE
01/26/1988FiledBriefing Completed
01/26/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 012988 SCHPRD BE
05/26/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/26/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988AFFIRMED JDGMT AF JDGMT OF CONVICTION PANELMKTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE 544 A.2d 714
07/21/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 1378
08/11/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD