judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HEMSLEY, ANTHONY R. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1733
Short Caption:HEMSLEY, ANTHONY R. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M7680-86Filed Date:12/29/1986

Opening Event Date:12/29/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/10/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/28/1987
Argued/Submitted:05/04/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/12/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Robert H. Haas YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Saul M. PilchenYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HEMSLEY, ANTHONY R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ARTHUR EVANS & NOTE - 01 GREGORY SPENCER
12/29/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/08/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S FIRST DOCKETING STATEMENT(BEFORE CJA APPOINT.) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT HAAS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 022787 SCHPRD R
03/19/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT SECOND DSA--AFTER CJA APPOINT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (59 PGS - SHELTON) PB PANEL SCDATE 041787 SCHPRD RT
06/10/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/10/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 21ST JB PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD BA
08/31/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 082187 SCHPRD BA
08/31/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL LODGED BRF;BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD OPE
10/20/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 25TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 102687 SCHPRD BE
11/18/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 28, 1987 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 112587 SCHPRD BE
12/01/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 12/28/87; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD SL
12/28/1987FiledBriefing Completed
12/28/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD BE
05/04/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/04/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1988REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENT ON APPEAL /CAUSE RM FOR FURTHER PRCDGS PANELMKFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE 547 A.2d 132
08/18/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 1518 OPINION TYPE D JUDGE - RY PAGE # - 0000
09/12/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD