Case Information: 40821 | |||
Short Caption: | ROBINSON VS. BANK OF AMERICA | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0103954 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/04/2003 / King, Patrick | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/27/2003 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Terry A. Friedman--check no. 3478. | ||
01/27/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 03-01407 | |
02/04/2003 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/10/2003 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 03-02308 | |
02/12/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Patrick O. King. (Docketing statement) | ||
03/10/2003 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 03-04006 | |
03/10/2003 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 03-04007 | |
03/21/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 03-04839 | |
03/21/2003 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |