judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARK MORRISON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0401
Short Caption:MARK MORRISON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1136-86Filed Date:04/21/1987

Opening Event Date:04/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/14/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/30/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/14/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/21/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMark Morrison N
William T. MorrisonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Saul M. PilchenYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MORRISON, MARK UNITED STATES
04/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/20/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM T. MORRISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD DSA
06/19/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD R
06/25/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/04/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 080487 SCHPRD BA
08/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (104 PGS. - SWAGERTY) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (173 PGS - RAMOS) GG PANEL SCDATE 100187 SCHPRD RT
10/14/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/14/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/24/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 23, 1987 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD BA
12/22/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 122387 SCHPRD BA
01/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/29/88 (NO OPPO) PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 012788 SCHPRD BE
02/25/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/30/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD BE
03/15/1988ORDER GRANTING MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE APLE'S BRF TO 3/30/88-NFX PB PANEL SCDATE 031588 SCHPRD V
03/30/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/30/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF & APPENDIX RJG PANEL SCDATE 033088 SCHPRD BE
07/14/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/14/1988SUBMITTED PANELTERGSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1988AFFIRMED JDGMT AF JDGMT OF CONVICTION PANELTERGSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 547 A.2d 996
09/29/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 1911
10/21/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD