judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROUND, DANIEL C. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1553
Short Caption:ROUND, DANIEL C. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6729-85Filed Date:10/28/1986

Opening Event Date:10/28/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/10/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/11/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROUND, DANIEL C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 APPEAL FROM ORD DENYING MOTION NOTE - 01 TO SEAL ARREST RECORD
10/28/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/14/1986STATEMENT RE: TRANSCRIPT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1986ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1986RECEIVED APLT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (101 PGS - OLIVER) GG PANEL SCDATE 122986 SCHPRD R
02/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (61 PGS - VAN BREMEN) GG PANEL SCDATE 020287 SCHPRD RT
02/10/1987FiledRecord Completed
02/24/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL TRANSCRIPTS ARE FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 032387 SCHPRD BA
08/12/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 030987 SCHPRD OPE
04/22/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (9 PGS - OLIVER) JB PANEL SCDATE 060188 SCHPRD RT
04/25/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 6TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD BA
07/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 070688 SCHPRD BA
07/21/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
07/21/1988ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELPY SCDATE 071388 SCHPRD V
07/21/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
08/11/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD