Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/29/2003 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mark H. Gunderson, Ltd.--check no. 14679. | | |
01/29/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 03-01560 |
02/11/2003 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 03-02413 |
02/12/2003 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Philip A. Olsen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | | |
02/13/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Philip A. Olsen. (Docketing statement) | | |
04/04/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 40834/40866/41080. | | 03-06024 |
05/01/2003 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 3, 2003. | | 03-07403 |
07/22/2003 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. Nos. 40834/40866-cases are not consolidated. | | 03-12352 |
10/27/2003 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. Nos. 40866/41080-cases are not consolidated. | | 03-17877 |
01/15/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 10, 2004. Nos. 40834/40866-cases are not consolidated. | | 04-00902 |
02/19/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued until March. Nos. 40834/40866/41080-cases are not consolidated. | | 04-03225 |
04/20/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Judge recommends that these cases be removed from the settlement conference program. Nos. 40834/40866/41080-cases are not consolidated. | | 04-07307 |
04/27/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Judge recommends that these cases be removed from the settlement conference program. Nos. 40834/40866/41080-cases are not consolidated. | | 04-07737 |
05/26/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Consolidation. Appellant has filed a motion to consolidate these three related appeals. Cause appearing, we grant the unopposed motion and consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. Further, pursuant to the written request of the settlement judge and good cause appearing, these consolidated appeals are removed from the settlement conference program. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a). Further, appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix, addressing the issues raised in all appeals. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn 1—[We note that Life Partners, Inc., a Texas Corporation, is a respondent in Docket No. 41080 only. Accordingly, any answering brief or portion of an answering brief on behalf of Life Partners shall address only the issues raised in that appeal.] Nos. 40834/40866/41080 | | 04-09691 |
07/28/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to Request Transcripts. On May 26, 2004, this court entered an order granting appellant's request to consolidate these appeals. We again direct appellant to request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a). Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the appropriate document. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal. Nos. 40834/40866/41080. (04-13718) | | 04-13718 |
08/09/2004 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Nos. 40834/40866/41080. | | 04-14353 |
10/08/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to file Opening Brief. On May 26, 2004, this court entered an order consolidating these three related appeals for appellate purposes. Pursuant to that order the opening brief and appendix were due to be filed by September 23, 2004. To date, appellant has failed to file these documents. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn1[We note that Life Partners, Inc., a Texas Corporation, is a respondent in docket No. 41080 only. Accordingly, any answering brief or portion of an answering brief on behalf of Life Partners shall address only the issues raised in that appeal.] Nos. 40834/ 40866/ 41080. (04-18698) | | 04-18698 |
10/15/2004 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from law firm of Mark H. Gunderson, Ltd. The parties have entered an agreement and this case will be settled and dismissed. The pleading will be completed and filed with the court soon. Nos. 40834/40866/41080. | | 04-19128 |
10/26/2004 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 40834/40866/41080 | | 04-19766 |
11/08/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . these appeals are dismissed." NRAP 42(b). fn1[That portion of the May 26, 2004, order establishing a briefing schedule, and the October 8, 2004, order to file the opening brief, are vacated.] NNP/CLK. Nos. 40834/40866/41080. | | 04-20457 |
11/08/2004 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. Nos. 40834/40866/41080. | | |