Case Information: 40826 | |||
Short Caption: | OLSON VS. WELLS FARGO BANK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0200533A | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/04/2003 / King, Patrick | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/28/2003 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from James J. Rankl--check no. 220. | ||
01/28/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 03-01505 | |
02/04/2003 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/12/2003 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 03-02498 | |
02/14/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Patrick O. King. (Docketing statement) | ||
03/11/2003 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 03-04094 | |
03/11/2003 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 03-04095 | |
03/21/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 03-04840 | |
03/21/2003 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |