Case Information: 40837 | |||
Short Caption: | HEALTHCARE CONSULTING VS. LOCKE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0005013 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/11/2003 / Olsen, Philip | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 09/02/2004 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/29/2003 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bader & Ryan, Ltd.--check no. 11374. | ||
01/29/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 03-01581 | |
02/11/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | 03-02382 | |
02/12/2003 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Philip A. Olsen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/14/2003 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 03-02581 | |
02/18/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Philip A. Olsen. (Docketing statement) | ||
02/19/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Notices of Entry of Order filed 2/4/03 for three orders filed 1/29/03. | 03-02798 | |
04/11/2003 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 03-06168 | |
04/17/2003 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 03-06549 | |
05/05/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 03-07538 | |
08/12/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 03-13470 | |
09/02/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed August 12, 2003. Appellant shall have until November 13, 2003, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. | 03-14673 | |
11/13/2003 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 03-18924 | |
11/13/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. | 03-18925 | |
12/16/2003 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 03-20910 | |
12/19/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 17, 2004. | 03-21154 | |
02/02/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 04-02095 | |
02/04/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed February 2, 2004. Appellant shall have until March 18, 2004, to file and serve the reply brief. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. Failure to file a timely reply brief may be treated as a waiver of the right to file a reply brief. NRAP 28(c). | 04-02201 | |
03/11/2004 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 04-04610 | |
03/15/2004 | Other | Other. Received table of contents to reply brief. Attached to inside front cover of original and copies of brief. | ||
09/02/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. See NRAP 34(f)(1). | 04-16001 | |
09/02/2004 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP04-NB/DA/MG | ||
11/09/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment and order of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-20643 | |
12/07/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-21157 | |
12/07/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/20/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 8, 2004. | 04-21157 |