judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MORRIS, LOLITA UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1625
Short Caption:MORRIS, LOLITA UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M8317-86Filed Date:11/26/1986

Opening Event Date:11/26/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/24/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/29/1987
Argued/Submitted:12/02/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Allan P. Mackinnon YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Elizabeth TrosmanYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MORRIS, LOLITA UNITED STATES
11/26/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/24/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/29/1987FiledBriefing Completed
12/02/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/04/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition