judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PRESTON GAYLES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0347
Short Caption:PRESTON GAYLES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5220-86Filed Date:03/27/1987

Opening Event Date:03/27/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/29/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/18/1988
Argued/Submitted:10/27/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/18/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPreston Gayles N
Gregory C. Powell YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas J. Kelly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GAYLES, PRESTON UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 091087 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 FOR LV TO FILE SUP DSA; CLK TO NOTE - 02 FILE LDGD SUP DSA; GRANT APLT NOTE - 02 MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 NOTE - 03 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS NOTE - 03 CT.
03/27/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GREGORY C. POWELL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD DSA
06/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD R
06/05/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 071587 SCHPRD BA
07/21/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/10/1987MISCELLANEOUS SUPPLEMENTAL DOCKETING STATE OF APLT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/10/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072287 SCHPRD OPE
10/29/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/29/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(149 PGS. -- SCHERTZER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 092187 SCHPRD RT
12/09/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 29, 1987 RJG PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BA
01/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/8/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1988ORDER GRANT MO'S OF APLT & CLK TO FL LODGED BRF OF APLT; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 012288 SCHPRD X
03/28/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 18, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD BE
04/12/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 4/18/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 040688 SCHPRD V
04/18/1988FiledBriefing Completed
04/18/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD BE
08/18/1988ORDER SS, CASE SCHED ON SUM CAL OF 10/27/88; COUNSEL MAY REQ ORAL ARG IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD READY
10/27/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/27/1988SUBMITTED PANELPYMKST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELPYMKST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/18/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL MLR PANEL SCDATE 062389 SCHPRD R