judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WESLEY (SAMUEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34766
Short Caption:WESLEY (SAMUEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C69503Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/28/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/02/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-08245
09/02/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
09/15/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 29, 1999. To Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. 99-08719
09/16/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. July 29, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. 99-08750
09/17/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-08798
01/05/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 31, 2000. 00-00163
02/02/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 1/31/00. 00-01668
02/02/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-01669
02/29/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-03159
02/29/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-03161
03/01/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. To Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-03215
03/31/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 28, 2000. 00-05214
04/28/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 4/26/00. 00-06951
04/28/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-RR/CY/DA 00-09022
06/27/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11021
06/27/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/15/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2000. 00-11021