judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOIS REINS and GERHARDT REINS v. RITA PAYNE, M.D. and L. CHARLES CHRISTENSEN, M.D.

Case Heading (06-208)
Case Number:06-208Case Docketed On:08/09/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law
Short Title:LOIS REINS and GERHARDT REINS v. RITA PAYNE, M.D. and L. CHARLES CHRISTENSEN, M.D.
Full Title:LOIS REINS and GERHARDT REINS, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. RITA PAYNE, M.D. and L. CHARLES CHRISTENSEN, M.D., Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLois ReinsLarry G. Grubbs
AppellantGerhardt ReinsLarry G. Grubbs
AppelleeRita Payne M.D.Jeffrey C. Brinkerhoff
AppelleeL. Charles Christensen M.D.Scott P. Klosterman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/09/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/09/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/09/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/09/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/18/2006Event - Phone Call - Received call from counsel for appellant indicating that the matter has settled and he will file a motion for voluntary dismissal.EventPhone CallFinal
10/31/2006System - Status check - other - Contacted counsel for appellant regarding status of dismissal. The motion is in the mail.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
11/06/2006Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
11/07/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
11/07/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal