judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROY RICHARDSON V. WMATA

Case Information: 10-CV-0871
Short Caption:ROY RICHARDSON V. WMATAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5603-07Filed Date:07/13/2010

Opening Event Date:07/13/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRoy Richardson YPro SeN
AppelleeWashington Metropolitan Area Transit AuthorityN
Carol B. O'KeeffeNN
Fredric H. Schuster NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/13/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/23/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 13, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
07/27/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 6/9/10, 6/10/10, 6/14/10 & 6/15/10) (elp)
09/14/2010APPEARANCE of Fredric Schuster as counel for WMATA.
10/07/2010 On consideration of the Statement Regarding Transcript filed with this court on July 27, 2010, and it appearing that appellant has not yet ordered the necessary transcripts for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order take the necessary steps to order the transcripts with the Court Reporting and Recording Division of the Superior Court and submit a copy of that order with this court. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
10/12/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
10/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (17-psg/wood 12/7/09 proc.)
10/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2(32-pgs/wood 12/8/09 proc.)w/cd attached
10/21/2010RECORD INDEX
11/03/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion and financial information statement to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, and it appearing that appellant is requesting transcript for this appeal it is ORDERED that appellant's motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is granted. However, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, appellant must file a motion with the Court Reporting Division for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s) for determination in accordance with Hancock V. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A. 2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for decision as to whether transcripts will provided at no costs. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to this order shall result in the dismissal of this appeal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (ETW) elp
11/08/2010RECEIVED - aplt's motion for appeal transcript (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 6/8/10, 6/9/10, 6/10/10, 6/14/10 & 6/15/10) (elp)
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (164-pgs/hamilton 6/8/10 proc.)
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (56-pgs/hamilton 6/9/10 proc.)
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (350-pgs/jeon 6/10-15/10 proc.)w/cd
01/26/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/28/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
02/24/2011RECEIVED - copy of ltr that was sent from aple to the aplt regarding what to include in the joint appdx
03/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF
03/10/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- To aplt's motion for extension of time to file his brief (WMATA)
03/29/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the limited appendix, and the opposition thereto, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed with this court on or before May 9, 2011. (ETW) elp
05/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appointment of counsel (Served by DCCA by mail)dwm (*opp) (elp)
05/17/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion for extension of time
05/31/2011 On consideration of appellant's motions for the appointment of counsel and for an extension of time to file the brief and appendix, the opposition thereto, and it appearing that there is no statutory right to court-appointed counsel in this civil matter, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion for appointment of counsel is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (ETW) elp
07/08/2011 On consideration of this court's order of May 31, 2011, granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the limited appendix on or before June 30, 2011, and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal wtihout further notice. (JAC) elp
08/05/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
08/05/2011FiledDismissed
08/05/2011FiledChange Of Address Received From Roy Richardson
09/02/2011FiledMandate