judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT C. ARRINGTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0302
Short Caption:ROBERT C. ARRINGTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8755-85Filed Date:03/24/1987

Opening Event Date:03/24/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/14/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/22/1988
Argued/Submitted:02/23/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/28/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert C. Arrington N
David B. Smith YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Ann K. H. SimonYN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ARRINGTON, ROBERT C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 100687 ORDER: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 01 IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE WITH NOTE - 02 THIS CT INDICATING DATE THAT NOTE - 02 RT WAS ORDERED, THE NAME OF CT NOTE - 03 RPTR PREPARING THE RT, THE NOTE - 03 ESTIMATED # OF PAGES & ESTIMA- NOTE - 04 TED COMPLETION DATE OF THE RT. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 082288 ORDER: SS, VACATING NOTE - 05 8/10/88 ORDER; FO: GRANT APLE NOTE - 06 MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR & CLK TO NOTE - 06 FILE LDGD APLE BR & CALENDAR NOTE - 07 CASE ASAP. NOTE - 07
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/02/23 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SMITHDA FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BLACKTH FOR - APPELLEE
03/24/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID B. SMITH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 040387 SCHPRD CHECK
05/14/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD DSA
05/29/1987RECORD ON APPEAL TW PANEL SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD R
06/03/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED TW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD BA
08/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (13 PGS. - BREMEN) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1987FiledRecord Completed
09/14/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(221 PGS. -- RAMOS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD RT
09/15/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/16/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 102087 SCHPRD BA
10/06/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD OPE
10/22/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 102687 SCHPRD STATE
11/18/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD CHECK
01/26/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1988RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER OF APPELLANT TO COUNSEL RE: APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/11/1988MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, BRIEF FOR APPELLANT DUE TO CONFLICT OF INTEREST RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/25/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/28/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD BE
03/03/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO SUPPL. BR. & CLK DIRTD TO FILE SUPPL. TO BR; APLE'S BR DUE 3/28/88 PANELPY SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD Q
03/03/1988APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM SUPPLEMENT TO APLT'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 14 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPTS COME IN (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032888 SCHPRD BE
04/05/1988ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE THE BR UNTIL 14 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 121787 SCHPRD RT
07/29/1988RECEIVED APLE BRIEF. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/04/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (21 PGS -- SALAZAR) EBP PANEL SCDATE 060188 SCHPRD RT
08/10/1988ORDER APLE BR DUE IN 14 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080588 SCHPRD CHECK
08/22/1988FiledBriefing Completed
08/22/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05 - 07. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 082488 SCHPRD BE
08/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD AND STATUS HEARING FORM) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1989ORDER SS, SCHED CASE FOR ORAL ARG. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/23/1989ARGUED PANELNWTEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELNWTEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/28/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD