judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT D. MITCHELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0403
Short Caption:ROBERT D. MITCHELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3516-86Filed Date:04/16/1987

Opening Event Date:04/16/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/17/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/15/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert D. Mitchell N
Nancy R. Beiter NN
AppellantRobert D. Mitchell N
Sidney R. BixlerYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Roberto Iraola YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MITCHELL, ROBERT D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: VINCENT D. JONES NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 11/22/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 02 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 03 VACATE APPMT OF NANCY BEITER & NOTE - 03 APPT SIDNEY BIXLER FOR APLT; NOTE - 04 GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO NOTE - 04 FL BRF TO 12/15/88; NFX.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/05/18 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BIXLERS FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - IRAOLAR FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 BEITERN VACATED 11/22/88.
04/16/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/20/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) NANCY R. BEITER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD DSA
06/16/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 061587 SCHPRD R
06/17/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/17/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD BA
07/16/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (9 PGS. - RHOADES) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 071787 SCHPRD CHECK
11/12/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (225 PGS - GLEASON) PB PANEL SCDATE 091087 SCHPRD RT
01/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 122287 SCHPRD BA
01/13/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/21/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 010588 SCHPRD DAS
01/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPTS ARE FILED (NO OPPO) PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 012188 SCHPRD BA
06/09/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 10/27/86 RT FROM CT RPTR GLEASON - NO MO HEARING ON THAT DATE. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 033188 SCHPRD RT
09/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 19TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 091488 SCHPRD BA
09/16/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD BE
10/11/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR & CLK TO FILE LGD APLT BR; APLE BR DUE IN 30 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091588 SCHPRD M
10/13/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 16TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 110988 SCHPRD BE
10/24/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 11/16/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD CHECK
11/04/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF NANCY R. BEITER AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-15-88 AD PANEL SCDATE 111688 SCHPRD BE
11/22/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SIDNEY R. BIXLER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD CHECK
12/15/1988FiledBriefing Completed
12/15/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 121588 SCHPRD BE
12/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(8 PGS/GLEASON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1989LETTER LTR GRANTING REQ OF APLT FOR ARG ON SUM CAL OF 5/18/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 042689 SCHPRD OPE
05/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/18/1989ARGUED PANELMKNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL... EXCEPT 2d CONVICTION OF PID RV w/INSTR TO VA ITS SENTENCE PANELMKNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD