judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BENJAMIN S. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0402
Short Caption:BENJAMIN S. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4775-86Filed Date:04/16/1987

Opening Event Date:04/16/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/10/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/28/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBenjamin S. Williams N
Ronny E. Jones NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, BENJAMIN S. UNITED STATES
04/16/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/20/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RONNY E. JONES, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD DSA
06/10/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/10/1987RECORD ON APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 061587 SCHPRD R
06/15/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/30/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD BA
05/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (93 PGS - WRAY) GT PANEL SCDATE 093087 SCHPRD RT
05/16/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/03/1988ORDER CT RPTR TO FILE 10/23 & 10/24/ 86 RT BY 7/20/88-ABSO-NFX; FO: APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFT RT.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD BA
08/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (277 PGS. -- JACKSON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 072088 SCHPRD RT
09/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS TO OCTOBER 19TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD BA
10/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 101988 SCHPRD BA
10/31/1988ORDER HOLD MO TO DISMISS IN ABEYANCE PENDING FILING OF STATE IN 20 DAYS IN ACCORD W/JOHNSON. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 102588 SCHPRD M
11/03/1988AFFIDAVIT OF APLT IN SUPPORT OF APPEAL WITHDRAWAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD STATE
12/05/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/05/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO DISMISS. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 111688 SCHPRD V
12/05/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
12/28/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD