judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LARRY DANIELS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0384
Short Caption:LARRY DANIELS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5321-85Filed Date:04/08/1987

Opening Event Date:04/08/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/25/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/08/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/01/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLarry Daniels N
John C. Krollman NN
AppellantLarry Daniels N
Joanne D. Slaight YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William E. Lawler YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DANIELS, LARRY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 121687 ORDER: (TREATING APLT NOTE - 01 LTR OF 12/11 AS MO FOR RECONS NOTE - 02 OF 11/25/87 ORDER), MO DENIED; NOTE - 02 FO: APLT BR DUE 1/4/88. NOTE - 03 5/13/88 ORD: GRANT PRO SE REQ NOTE - 03 OF APLT TO W/D COUNSEL & NOTE - 04 VACATE APPMT OF JOHN C. KROLL- NOTE - 04 MAN & APPT JOANNE D. SLAIGHT NOTE - 05 FOR APLT; BRF OF APLT DUE IN NOTE - 05 40 DAYS.
01/01/1906 KROLLMANJ VACATED 5/13/88.
04/08/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/20/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN C. KROLLMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD DSA
06/05/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 060887 SCHPRD R
11/05/1987RECEIVED MOTION FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, REQUESTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUN- SEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/25/1987ORDER DENY APLT MO TO REQ W/DRAWAL OF COUNSEL; FO: APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD RT
12/11/1987RECEIVED LTR FROM APLT RE: DENIAL OF MO TO W/DRAWAL COUNSEL. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 02. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE PENDING PRODUCTION OF TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 010488 SCHPRD BA
01/27/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO ONLY TO EXTENT THAT COUNSEL IN 10 DAYS FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RT ORDER. PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE TO JANUARY 27TH ORDER REGARD- ING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD STATE
02/11/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S RESPONSE TO JANUARY 27TH ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 1/27 ORDER. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE ANSA; CLK TO FILE LDGD ANS; FO APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFT RT.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD M
05/02/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (267 PGS - CARTER) JB PANEL SCDATE 050188 SCHPRD RT
05/03/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1988RECEIVED MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, REQUESTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUN- SEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOANNE D. SLAIGHT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03-05. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 051088 SCHPRD Q
05/18/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF JOHN KROLLMAN AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT (JOIN WITH PRO SE REQUEST) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 062388 SCHPRD BA
07/14/1988ORDER COUNS FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STAT RE: RT; HOLD MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR IN ABEYANCE.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062188 SCHPRD M
07/25/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO JULY 14TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD STATE
08/17/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFT RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072788 SCHPRD M
02/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (34 PGS - CARTER) JB PANEL SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD RT
02/16/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COUSEL RECIEVES ADDITIONAL TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 032889 SCHPRD BA
05/05/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING BA UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER COMPL REC, INCL. TRANSC. FILED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
05/11/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (18 PGS - BOSTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD CHECK
06/20/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-20-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 062089 SCHPRD BA
07/06/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MOTION FOR EXT OF TIME TO FILE BRF TO 7/20/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD OPE
07/20/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-24-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 072089 SCHPRD BA
07/24/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT & BRF OF APLT IS FL; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080289 SCHPRD X
09/05/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 25TH (NO OPA) JB PANEL SCDATE 090489 SCHPRD BE
09/11/1989ORDER GRT APLE'S MOTION FOR AN EXT OF TIME W/IN WHICH TO FILE THE BRF TO 9/25/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD V
09/25/1989FiledBriefing Completed
09/25/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD BE
02/08/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/08/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWFEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWFEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/01/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD