judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RANDALL K. BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0373
Short Caption:RANDALL K. BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3644-82Filed Date:02/06/1987

Opening Event Date:02/06/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/14/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRandall K. Brown N
Daniel M. Schember NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, RANDALL K. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MICHELLE ANDERSON & NOTE - 01 BRUCE WOOTEH
02/06/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 040887 SCHPRD R
05/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DANIEL M. SCHEMBER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD DSA
03/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (117 PGS - BURNS) PB PANEL SCDATE 040188 SCHPRD RT
03/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (54 PGS. -- DAVIS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 041588 SCHPRD RT
06/06/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (43 PGS - TOOBY) GT PANEL SCDATE 053088 SCHPRD RT
07/18/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/17/88 MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD BA
08/16/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD BA
08/24/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
08/24/1988ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELPY SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD V
08/24/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
09/14/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD