judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TIMOTHY A. BARKSDALE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0388
Short Caption:TIMOTHY A. BARKSDALE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 87-CF-0303 Consolidated:87-CF-0388
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2186-86Filed Date:04/01/1987

Opening Event Date:04/01/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/05/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/24/1987
Argued/Submitted:05/03/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/23/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTimothy A. Barlsdale N
Boniface K. CobbinaYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Robert A. Spelke YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BARKSDALE, TIMOTHY A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: DARRYL ALONZO STEVENS NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 CON 87-303 NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 091587 ORDER: SS, CON 87-303 & NOTE - 03 87-388, FO: APLT BR IN 87-388 NOTE - 04 DUE W/IN 10 DAYS - ABSO -NFX; NOTE - 04 FO: CONS BR OF APLE DUE 30 DYS NOTE - 05 AFTER APLT BR IN 87-388 FILED. NOTE - 05
04/01/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/20/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BONIFACE K. COBBINA, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD DSA
06/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD R
06/05/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/05/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 31ST JB PANEL SCDATE 071587 SCHPRD BA
07/15/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 SEE 87-303 (73 PGS.-HART) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/7/87 PB PANEL SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 090787 SCHPRD BA
09/25/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 092587 SCHPRD BA
10/20/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 1ST JB PANEL SCDATE 103087 SCHPRD BE
10/26/1987APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APLE'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD OPA
11/17/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 12/1/87; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 110587 SCHPRD CHECK
11/27/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 15TH JB PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD BE
12/07/1987APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APLE'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 120987 SCHPRD OPA
12/15/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/24/1987FiledBriefing Completed
12/24/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/24/1987ORDER GRANT APLE MO , CLK TO FILE LDGD BR OF APLE & SCHED CASE ON CAL ASAP. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 121787 SCHPRD CHECK
01/04/1988APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO JANUARY 18, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO IN 87-303 FOR EXT TO FILE REPLY BR TO EXT THAT BR IS DUE IN 10 DAYS-NFX. PANELPY SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD OPE
05/03/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/03/1988SUBMITTED PANELPYMKBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELPYMKBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/23/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD