judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD B. DODSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0364
Short Caption:RICHARD B. DODSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7261-86Filed Date:04/03/1987

Opening Event Date:04/03/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/10/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/30/1987
Argued/Submitted:04/14/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/13/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard B. Dodson N
Joseph H. Green, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Odessa F. Vincent YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DODSON, RICHARD B. UNITED STATES
04/03/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH H. GREEN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD DSA
06/04/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 060387 SCHPRD R
06/04/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (346 PGS - RAMOS) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/10/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 31ST JB PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD BA
08/28/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/10/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/10/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR, CLK TO FILE LDGD BR; APLE BR DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD OPE
09/30/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/29/87 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 101287 SCHPRD BE
11/03/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 102987 SCHPRD BE
11/17/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (GOVERNMENT'S EXHIBITS #1A-K, 4 & 5) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987FiledBriefing Completed
11/30/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/14/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKFERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELMKFERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/13/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD