judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYRONE M. LOVE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0361
Short Caption:TYRONE M. LOVE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5215-85Filed Date:03/25/1987

Opening Event Date:03/25/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/01/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/10/1988
Argued/Submitted:02/01/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/02/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyrone M. Love N
David Carey WollYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Su Zann Lamb YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LOVE, TYRONE M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 082487 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 NOTE - 02 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED; FO: NOTE - 02 COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DAYS TO NOTE - 03 FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RT, NOTE - 03 INDICATING NAME OF CT REPORTER NOTE - 04 PREPARING THE RT, ESTIMATED # NOTE - 04 OF PAGES TO BE FILED & ESTIMA- NOTE - 05 TED COMPLETION DATE OF THE RT. NOTE - 05
03/25/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID CAREY WOLL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD DSA
05/29/1987RECORD ON APPEAL TW PANEL SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD R
07/13/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD BA
08/24/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD OPE
09/14/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN ANSA TO COURTS 8/24/87 ORDER PB PANEL SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD STATE
11/10/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1( 9 PGS. -- RONAN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 010287 SCHPRD RT
03/01/1988FiledRecord Completed
03/01/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (153 PGS - RAMOS) JB PANEL SCDATE 010188 SCHPRD RT
03/02/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 17TH (NO OPPO) JB (PB) PANEL SCDATE 041188 SCHPRD BA
05/18/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 31, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 051788 SCHPRD BA
05/31/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/3/88 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/03/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL BRF ; CLK TO FL BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 052588 SCHPRD V
07/05/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 10, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD BE
08/10/1988FiledBriefing Completed
08/10/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 081088 SCHPRD BE
02/01/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/01/1989SUBMITTED PANELFESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/02/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD