judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYRONE T. ALSTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0343
Short Caption:TYRONE T. ALSTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6539-81Filed Date:03/19/1987

Opening Event Date:03/19/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/08/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/14/1987
Argued/Submitted:05/02/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/03/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyrone T. Alston N
Mindy A. DanielsYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ALSTON, TYRONE T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/14/87 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 TO ADOPT RT IN 22-1123 & IS NOTE - 02 DEEMED RT IN THIS CASE; GRANT NOTE - 02 MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF NOTE - 03 & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLE; CLK NOTE - 03 TO SCHED FOR CONSIDERATION AS NOTE - 04 SOON AS BIZ OF CRT PERMITS. NOTE - 04
01/01/1904JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
03/19/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MINDY A. DANIELS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD DSA
06/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD R
06/08/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/08/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 11TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD BA
08/07/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 10TH JB PANEL SCDATE 081187 SCHPRD BA
09/03/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/10/87; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 081987 SCHPRD OPE
09/10/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 091087 SCHPRD BA
09/10/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO ADOPT TRANS- SCRIPT IN APPEAL 82-1123 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 17TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 101587 SCHPRD BE
11/17/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/1/87 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1987FiledBriefing Completed
12/14/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 111887 SCHPRD DAS
12/14/1987COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT 82-1123 RT DEEMED RT IN THIS CASE. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/02/1988SUBMITTED PANELPYRGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELPYRGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/25/1988APPLICATION FOR COMPENSATION (CJA/CCAN) PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/03/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD