judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AL-RABADI, SALEEM J. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1674
Short Caption:AL-RABADI, SALEEM J. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M15595-85Filed Date:11/19/1986

Opening Event Date:11/19/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/02/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/15/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Jensen E. Barber NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901AL-RABADI, SALEEM J. UNITED STATES
11/19/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/17/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JENSEN E. BARBER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1987RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 011987 SCHPRD R
02/27/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (31 PGS - ALLISON) GG PANEL SCDATE 020587 SCHPRD RT
03/02/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (135 PGS.- SHELTON) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (237 PGS. - MITCHELL) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 123187 SCHPRD EBP
02/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 17, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 021688 SCHPRD BA
03/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/25/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/25/1988ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. PB PANELPY SCDATE 032388 SCHPRD V
03/25/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
04/15/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD