judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JENKINS, BRIAN A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1627
Short Caption:JENKINS, BRIAN A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Lead:86-CM-1627Consolidated: 86-CM-1691
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M3258-86Filed Date:11/19/1986

Opening Event Date:11/19/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/20/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/07/1989
Argued/Submitted:10/10/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/03/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Mark L. GoldstoneYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JENKINS, BRIAN A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MICHAEL A. WEST, NOTE - 01 MICHAEL G. WEST, AND NOTE - 02 MICHAEL JOHNSON NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 CON 86-1691 NOTE - 03
11/19/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARK L. GOLDSTONE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PB PANEL SCDATE 011987 SCHPRD R
08/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (137 PGS. - TOOBY) PM PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD RT
11/20/1987FiledRecord Completed
11/20/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (148 PGS - TOOBY) PB PANEL SCDATE 032387 SCHPRD RT
12/23/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED MLH (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 123087 SCHPRD BA
03/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (232 PGS - HAWKINS) PB PANEL SCDATE 030288 SCHPRD RT
05/02/1988ORDER CT RPTR TO FILE 9/9/86 RT BY 7/29/88 - ABSOLUTELY - NFX||| EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (25 PGS RT - BOSTON) GT PANEL SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD RT
08/26/1988ORDER SS, CONS 86-1627 & 86-1691; APLTS BRS DUE IN 40 DAYS & CON BR OF APLE 30 DAYS AFTER. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD BA
09/30/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/20/88 (NO OPE) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 100588 SCHPRD BA
10/25/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO TWENTY (20) DAYS FROM DATE THIS MOTION IS GRANTED (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 102088 SCHPRD BA
12/05/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 12/15/88. PB PANELRO SCDATE 100588 SCHPRD BA
12/15/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/20/88 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 121588 SCHPRD BA
12/20/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 86-1691 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BA; BRF OF APLT IN 86-1691 DUE IN 10. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD CHECK
01/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/21/89 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 020389 SCHPRD BE
01/27/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH #86-1691 & TO SET TIME FOR APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-7-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO TO CONSOLIDATE APPEAL AND CON BRF OF APLE DUE ON OR BEFORE 3/7/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD Q
03/17/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/7/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD V
04/07/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/07/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD BE
05/02/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (32 PGS - SHELTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/10/1989SUBMITTED PANELFEBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/03/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD