judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIMOTHY BALDWIN, Individually; LAUREL LINNER as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Linner, Deceased; ADAM WELLS as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jennifer Wells, Deceased v. MOUNTAIN FLIGHT SERVICE, INC., A Colorado Corporation

Case Heading (06-26)
Case Number:06-26Case Docketed On:02/15/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:TIMOTHY BALDWIN, Individually; LAUREL LINNER as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Linner, Deceased; ADAM WELLS as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jennifer Wells, Deceased v. MOUNTAIN FLIGHT SERVICE, INC., A Colorado Corporation
Full Title:TIMOTHY BALDWIN, Individually; LAUREL LINNER as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Linner, Deceased; ADAM WELLS as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Jennifer Wells, Deceased, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. MOUNTAIN FLIGHT SERVICE, INC., A Colorado Corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTimothy BaldwinRalph Adrian Cantafio
AppellantLaurel LinnerRalph Adrian Cantafio
AppellantAdam WellsMark E. Macy
AppelleeMountain Flight Service, Inc.W. Henry Combs III
Ross Roome McKelvey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/15/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/15/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/15/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/24/2006Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
03/27/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/27/2006Order - Stay briefingOrderStay briefingFinal
04/11/2006Order - Remanding to DC. (allowing 30 days for entry of order.)OrderRemanding to DCFinal
05/09/2006Motion - Extension of time - other. (Remand)MotionExtension of time - otherFinal
05/10/2006Motion - Extension of time - other (Supplement to Remand Extension)MotionExtension of time - otherFinal
05/11/2006Order - Remand (Granting extension through May 30, 2006.)OrderRemandFinal
06/05/2006Event - Phone Call. Contacted district court clerk on status of remand orders. The orders were entered on 5/16/06, they will send copies today.EventPhone CallFinal
06/06/2006Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Orders on remand.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder on remandFinal
06/07/2006Order - Dismiss - involuntary.OrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
06/07/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal