judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: JAMES W. BEANE, JR.

Case Information: 10-BG-0869
Short Caption:IN RE: JAMES W. BEANE, JR.Classification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Negotiated Settlement
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN340-07, ET ALFiled Date:07/16/2010

Opening Event Date:07/16/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
Elizabeth A. HermanNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentJames W. Beane NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/16/2010REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. that the court suspend respondent for six months with a requirement that he prove his fitness to practice as a condition of reinstatement.
07/29/2010TMC -
10/21/2010FiledSUSPENSION ORDERED that James W. Beane, Jr., is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia for six months, with reinstatement conditioned on a showing of fitness to practice law. The suspension shall be effective thirty days from the date of this opinion. See D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (f). We direct respondent's attention to the requirements of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g) and their effect on his eligibility for reinstatement. (FI,TH,NW)
12/08/2010RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of nonfiling by respondent the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.
12/20/2010AFFIDAVIT of respondent pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.