Case Information: 34767 | |||
Short Caption: | BURKETT (JOEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 39267 , 39390 , 41504 , 45769 , 63661 , 71725 , 71725-COA , 76647 , 76647-COA , 78774 , 78774-COA , 78868 , 78868-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C052190 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/31/2000 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/02/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
09/02/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
09/02/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-08248 | |
10/07/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34767, 34781, 34799, 34803. | 99-09640 | |
01/31/2000 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 1/28/00. | 00-01525 | |
01/31/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/10/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. For the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, we conclude that the district court properly denied appellant's petition. Briefing and oral argument are not warranted in this case. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB | 01-11623 | |
08/07/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-11655 | |
08/07/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/27/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. | 01-11655 |