judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FIDELITY & DEPOSIT COMPANY OF CURTIN & JOHNSON INC

Case Information: 86-CV-0326
Short Caption:FIDELITY & DEPOSIT COMPANY OF CURTIN & JOHNSON INCClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA10425-81Filed Date:02/26/1986

Opening Event Date:02/26/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/05/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/24/1986
Argued/Submitted:02/03/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
James K. Foley YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Arthur G. Kahn YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Daniel S. Roth NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Tarrant H. Lomax YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Craig B. Dunbar YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FIDELITY & DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND CURTIN & JOHNSON INC ET AL
01/01/1906 KAHNA (NAT'L CAPITAL BLDG & SUPPLY) ROTHD (TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY) LOMAXT (TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY) DUNBARC will present oral argument
02/26/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/05/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/24/1986FiledBriefing Completed
02/03/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/12/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition