judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BOBBY JOE JENKINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0824
Short Caption:BOBBY JOE JENKINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12757-87Filed Date:06/23/1988

Opening Event Date:06/23/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/31/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/13/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/23/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/15/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBobby Joe Jenkins N
Prudence Bushnell YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Nancy J. Woodward YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JENKINS, BOBBY JOE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: WAYNE PANNELL NOTE - 01
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/10/23 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BUSHNELLP FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BUNNELLS FOR - APPELLEE
06/23/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/19/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PRUDENCE BUSHNELL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD DSA
08/31/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/31/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD R
01/27/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (453 PGS RT - KACZOROWSKI) GT PANEL SCDATE 101288 SCHPRD RT
03/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-8-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 030889 SCHPRD BA
05/01/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING BA TO AND INC. 5/8/89. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD BA
05/16/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING APLT BR UNTIL 30 DAYS AFTER TRANSC IS DOCKETED. FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1989COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (59 PGS/KACZOROWSKI) AD PANEL SCDATE 010690 SCHPRD RT
02/01/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(12 PGS/DAVIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD RT
03/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 11, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 031390 SCHPRD BA
03/22/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 04-11-90; NFX. JJ PANEL SCDATE 031490 SCHPRD B
04/10/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 041190 SCHPRD BA
05/16/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 15, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 051690 SCHPRD BE
06/12/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FL BRIEF TO 6/15/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD B
06/13/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/13/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 061590 SCHPRD BE
09/11/1990ORDER SUA SPONTE THAT THIS CASE WILL BE ARGUED ON 10/23/90 AT 1:30 PM. MEH PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/23/1990ARGUED PANELNWTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELNWTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/15/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD