judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CLINTON T. ELDRIDGE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0775
Short Caption:CLINTON T. ELDRIDGE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead:88-CF-0775Consolidated: 90-CF-0140 , 90-CF-1328
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6638-83Filed Date:06/21/1988

Opening Event Date:06/21/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/12/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/24/1991
Argued/Submitted:02/25/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/19/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantClinton T. Eldridge N
Stuart F. JohnsonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Teresa A. Howie YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ELDRIDGE, CLINTON T UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 03/08/90 ORD: STUART FISK NOTE - 01 JOHNSON, ESQ., APPTD. TO REPT. NOTE - 02 APPELLANT IN NO. 90-140; DSA NOTE - 02 TO BE FLD W/IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 03 CON: 90-140 & 90-1328 NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 02/28/91 ORD: APL MO STAY NOTE - 04 BRFG SCED GRNTD. F/O COUNSEL NOTE - 05 FOR APLT TO FL BRF BY 3/4/91. NOTE - 05 F/O APLE BRF TO BE FLD W/IN NOTE - 06 30 DYS THEREAFTER. NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 6/24/91 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 07 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & THE CLK NOTE - 08 SHALL FL APLT'S BRF; GRANT MOS NOTE - 08 OF APLE TO EXT TM & THE CLK NOTE - 09 SHALL FL APLE'S BRIEF; GRANT NOTE - 09 APLT'S PRO SE MO'S TO CONS NOTE - 10 90-1328 W/88-775 & 90-140 & TO NOTE - 10 ACCEPT BRFS FL IN 88-775 & 90- NOTE - 11 140 AS THE BRFS IN 90-1328; NOTE - 11 CLK TO SCHED CASE AS SOON AS NOTE - 12 CAL PERMITS. NOTE - 12
01/01/1905TRDATE- 92/02/25 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - JOHNSONSTUART FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - HOWIET FOR - APPELLEE
06/21/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/06/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STUART FISK JOHNSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD DSA
08/26/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED ADD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/26/1988RECORD ON APPEAL ADD PANEL SCDATE 072688 SCHPRD R
08/14/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT MOTION FOR SUMMARY VACATION OF CONVICTION AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO DISQUAIFY COUNSEL STUART F. JOHNSON, AND APPOINT NEW COUNSEL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: STATUS OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989STATEMENT REPORT CONCERNING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (3 PGS. -- SANBORN) PANEL SCDATE 100589 SCHPRD RT
11/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (6 PGS - RUST) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (38 PGS - SANBORN & 13 PGS RIZZA) PF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1989ORDER DENY PRO SE MOTIONS TO DIS- QUALIFY COUNSEL & SUMMARY VA- CATION OF CONVICTION. MEH PANELFEBETE SCDATE 120789 SCHPRD VS
12/18/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(KACZOROWSKI-27 PGS) AD PANEL SCDATE 032590 SCHPRD RT
02/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (ORD OF JUDGE HAMILTON DATED 1/25/90) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1990ORDER SS CONSOLIDATING 88-775 & 90-140 FOR ALL PURP; FO (SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 & 2) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(88 PGS/HART) AD PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD RT
03/19/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 90-140 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR APPLICATION FOR AN EMERGENCY COURT ORDER RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1990RECORD ON APPEAL IN 90-140 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (208 PGS. -- SCHERTZER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032490 SCHPRD RT
04/12/1990RECORD COMPLETED
05/07/1990RECEIVED PRO SE MO FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT ORDERS (APLT) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1990RECEIVED COPY OF APLT'S PETITION FOR A WRIT OF PROHIBITION/MANDAMUS FILED IN US SUPREME COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1990ORDER DENYG PRO SE MOS FOR RECON OF CT ORDERS & FOR AN EMERGENCY COURT ORDER. CWC PANELFEBETE SCDATE 080890 SCHPRD VS
08/24/1990RECEIVED PRO SE MOTION/CONDITION OF RE- LEASE PENDING APPEAL JT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1990RECEIVED OPPOSITION OF APPELLEE TO APLTS, PRO SE, MOTION FOR RELEASE PENDING APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF APPELLANT'S PRO SE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/15/1991ORDER APLT MO FOR RELEASE PENDING APPEAL IS HEREBY DENIED PANELNWTEWA SCDATE 122090 SCHPRD VS
01/15/1991STATEMENT OF APLT 3RD AND FINAL REPORT CONCERNING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF PRO SE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1991ORDER GRNT APLT MO TO FILE LODGD PRO SE BRF. APLE BRF SHALL BE FLD W/IN 30 DYS FRM DT OF ORD. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 010991 SCHPRD TO
01/30/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COUNSEL FOR APLT HAS FILED HIS BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 021891 SCHPRD BE
02/01/1991APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APLE'S MOTION TO STAY BRIEFING SCHD AJ PANEL SCDATE 021191 SCHPRD OPA
02/25/1991LETTER RE CASE FROM APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03 PANELRBH SCDATE 021491 SCHPRD GR
03/01/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/18/91 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 90-1328 AND/OR CONS. APPEALS 90-140 & 88-775 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (SECOND) TO MARCH 25, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/25/1991RECEIVED APLTS' BRIEF & APPENDIX AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/01/1991LETTER FROM APLT IN RESPONSE TO LETTER FROM PETKOFSKY AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 12 DAYS (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/06/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 9, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1991RECEIVED BRIEF OF APLE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1991NOTICE OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY PRO SE PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-12. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 052991 SCHPRD TO
06/24/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
08/05/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR MORE INDEPT ANSWER TO PRO SE BRIEFS FILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1991MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO BE PRESENT AT ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1991ORDER APLT'S PRO SE MOTIONS HELD IN ABEYANCE PENDING ASSGN TO A MERITS DIVISION. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1991RECEIVED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF REPLY BR FILED PRO-SE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1991RECEIVED LTR FROM APLT RE JURY WAIVER FORM PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1991RECEIVED PRO SE MOTION FROM APLT IN SUPPORT OF THE 4TH AMENDMENT ISSUE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1991LETTER RETURNING 10/31 & 11/6 PRO SE PLEADINGS TO APLT. COPY SENT ALSO TO ATTR FOR APLT. AC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1991LETTER TO APLT REJECTING 11/18 PLEADING. COPY TO ATTR. AC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1992ORDER APLT'S PRO SE MOTIONS TO BE PRESENT FOR ARGUMENT 2/25/92 DENIED. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 010692 SCHPRD VS
02/24/1992MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR CRT TO ORD & LISTEN TO TAPE OF ACCEPT. OF GUILTY PLEA BELOW RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/25/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/25/1992ARGUED PANELFESCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1992CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1992ORDER DENY APLT'S MOT FOR CT ORD TO HEAR TAPE RECORDED ACCEPTANCE TO GUILTY PLEAS KHO PANELFESCMK SCDATE 030992 SCHPRD O
12/30/1992AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART FE SC MK
01/22/1993APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING
01/29/1993ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING (FESCMK)
03/26/1993ORD GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING and the Clerk is directed to file the lodged petition for rehearing. It is Further Ordered that the petition for rehearing is denied. (FESCMK)
03/26/1993APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING
04/19/1993MANDATE ISSUED