judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

COLLIER, JAMES M. REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE

Case Information: 86-CV-0350
Short Caption:COLLIER, JAMES M. REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA10935-84Filed Date:02/10/1986

Opening Event Date:02/10/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/07/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/03/1986
Argued/Submitted:03/10/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames M. Collier NPro SeN
AppellantKenneth F. Collier NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Lawrence E. Carr, IIIYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COLLIER, JAMES M. ET AL REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE ET AL
02/10/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/07/1986FiledRecord Completed
11/03/1986FiledBriefing Completed
03/10/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/26/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition