judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAROLD PROCTOR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0847
Short Caption:HAROLD PROCTOR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F190-88Filed Date:07/05/1988

Opening Event Date:07/05/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/14/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/03/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/20/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHarold Proctor N
G. Godwin Oyewole YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Oscar S. Mayers YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PROCTOR, HAROLD UNITED STATES
07/05/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/20/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) G. GODWIN OYEWOLE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD DSA
08/22/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 4/18-4/21/88 RT FROM CT RPTR BURNS. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD R
11/14/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/14/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(234 PGS/ BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 010589 SCHPRD RT
12/27/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 122688 SCHPRD BA
01/23/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 1, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 013189 SCHPRD BE
02/16/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/1/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD X
02/27/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 1, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 030189 SCHPRD BE
03/23/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 4/1/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD OPA
04/03/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/03/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 040189 SCHPRD BE
09/20/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/20/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD