Case Information: 40906 | |||
Short Caption: | EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF NEV. VS. NILSON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A449063 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/14/2003 / Gang, Leonard | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/10/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Returned check no. 0242 in the amount of $250 to Beckett & Yott, Ltd. (Filing fee is $200.) | ||
02/10/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 03-02301 | |
02/14/2003 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Leonard I. Gang. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/05/2003 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Beckett & Yott - check no. 0247. | ||
04/10/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 03-06035 | |
04/11/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed April 10, 2003. The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement received on April 7, 2003. | 03-06167 | |
04/11/2003 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 03-05779 | |
04/15/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Leonard I. Gang. (docketing statement) | ||
06/19/2003 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 15, 2003. | 03-10264 | |
10/30/2003 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 7, 2003. | 03-18148 | |
12/02/2003 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. | 03-20004 | |
02/11/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 04-02701 | |
02/11/2004 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 04-02702 | |
03/12/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 04-04654 | |
03/12/2004 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |