judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GARCIA W. SHIELDS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0907
Short Caption:GARCIA W. SHIELDS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F68950-77Filed Date:07/15/1988

Opening Event Date:07/15/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGarcia W. Shields N
Dennis M. HartNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SHIELDS, GARCIA W. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: JOYCE KINARD AKA NOTE - 01 JOYCE EASTERLING
07/15/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/29/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DENNIS M. HART, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD DSA
10/13/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 091488 SCHPRD R
10/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(12 PGS/SALAZAR) AD PANEL SCDATE 100288 SCHPRD RT
12/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/22/1989ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PURSUANT TO APPELLANT'S OWN MOTION FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
01/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD