judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VERNARD H. DIXON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0854
Short Caption:VERNARD H. DIXON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9192-85Filed Date:07/06/1988

Opening Event Date:07/06/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/07/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/10/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVernard H. Dixon N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DIXON, VERNARD H. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON: 88-853 NOTE - 01
07/06/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/15/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1988ORDER SUA SPONTE THAT THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES WITH 88-853. PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD DSA
07/25/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1988ORDER SS, CON 88-853 & 88-854 FL BRF 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD. PB PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD R
09/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(266 PGS/VAN BREMEN) AD PANEL SCDATE 083088 SCHPRD RT
09/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (205 PGS/RUST) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(194 PGS/ FINNERIN) AD PANEL SCDATE 101688 SCHPRD SR
10/19/1988APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO SUPP REC & CLK OF SUPER TO TRANSMIT 4 AUTOPSY SLIDES AS SUPP REC.DAS PANELRO SCDATE 110888 SCHPRD Q
12/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(11-16-88 ORDER-AND EXHIBITS AD PANEL SCDATE 121688 SCHPRD SR
12/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(139 PGS /HART) AD PANEL SCDATE 121388 SCHPRD RT
01/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6(51 PGS/ALLISON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (18 PGS. -- JACKSON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 010789 SCHPRD RT
02/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (115 PGS. -- MILLER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #9 (33 PGS - WRAY) JB PANEL SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD RT
12/14/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (518-PGS/BOSTON) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1990FiledRecord Completed
03/07/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #10 (5 PGS. -- BOSTON; 23 PGS. -- BOSTON; 85 PGS. -- BOSTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/13/90 (NO OPPO) GG PANEL SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD BA
05/31/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/13/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD B
06/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 061390 SCHPRD BA
06/18/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/18/1990ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PURSUANT TO APPELLANT'S OWN MOTION FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/18/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
07/10/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD