judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GILBERT REYNOLDS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0870
Short Caption:GILBERT REYNOLDS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4617-78Filed Date:07/14/1988

Opening Event Date:07/14/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/13/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/22/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/15/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/16/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGilbert P. Reynolds N
Greta C. Van Susteren NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Thomas K. Clancy NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
L. Robert Miller YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Michael L. Volkov YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901REYNOLDS, GILBERT UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/30/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF GRETA VAN SUSTEREN & APPT NOTE - 02 THOMAS K. CLANCY FOR APLT;APLT NOTE - 03 TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 12/9/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 04 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 05 VACATE APPMT OF THOMAS K. NOTE - 05 CLANCY & APPT L. ROBERT MILLER NOTE - 06 FOR APLT; BRF OF APLT DUE IN NOTE - 06 40 DAYS.
01/01/1906 VAN SUSTERENG VACATED 9/30/88 CLANCYT VACATED 12/9/88.
07/14/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/21/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GRETA C. VAN SUSTEREN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF (GRETA C. VAN SUSTEREN) AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS K. CLANCY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 091388 SCHPRD R
10/06/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO SEPTEMBER 30TH COURT ORDER REGARDING DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/13/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 112288 SCHPRD BA
11/29/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) L. ROBERT MILLER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-06. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 102588 SCHPRD N
01/10/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 17, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 011989 SCHPRD BA
02/03/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 2/17/89. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 012089 SCHPRD CHECK
02/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/20/89 (NO OPE) MLR PANEL SCDATE 021789 SCHPRD BA
02/24/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 3/20/89. ANY FURTHER REQ W/BE DISFAVORED. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD BA
03/20/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD BA
04/19/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-24-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD BE
05/05/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/24/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD OPA
05/24/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/22/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD BE
06/09/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/22/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 060589 SCHPRD OPA
06/22/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-20-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 062289 SCHPRD BE
07/17/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/20/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 071189 SCHPRD Q
07/20/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 3RD JB PB PANEL SCDATE 072089 SCHPRD BE
08/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 9, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/09/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/22/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 081789 SCHPRD V
02/15/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/15/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/16/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/03/1991RECEIVED LTR FROM APLT ASKING FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION RE THE COURTS DECISION PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/09/1991LETTER ANSWERING 8/29/91 LTR FROM APLT RE FURTHER INFORMATION RE DECISION IN CASE. MEH PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD