judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THOMAS G. DOEPEL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0903
Short Caption:THOMAS G. DOEPEL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10433-74Filed Date:07/08/1988

Opening Event Date:07/08/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/19/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThomas G. Doepel NPro SeN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Steven M. Buckman NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DOEPEL, THOMAS G. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/9/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 TO PROCEED ON APPEAL IN FORMA NOTE - 02 PAUPERIS & CLK TO FL PRO SE NOTE - 02 BRF OF APLT; STEVEN M. BUCK- NOTE - 03 MAN APPTD FOR APLT & TO ADVISE NOTE - 03 CRT IN 20 DAYS WHETHER A SUPP NOTE - 04 BRF WILL BE FL ON BEHALF OF NOTE - 04 APLT; MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO NOTE - 05 FL BRF HELD IN ABEY PENDG NOTE - 05 RESPONSE OF COUNSEL TO THIS NOTE - 06 ORDER. NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 703 F. SUPP. 995 (D.D.C. 1988) NOTE - 07
07/08/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/29/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 090788 SCHPRD R
10/12/1988LETTER TO APLT REQUESTING AFFIDAVIT (FORM 5) AND APPOINTING OF COUNSEL GG PANELDDW SCDATE 110888 SCHPRD BA
10/17/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S (PRO SE) BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 10/12/88 LETTER RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-19-88 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PRO SE. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN M. BUCKMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-06. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 102688 SCHPRD Q
12/19/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 18TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ORDER/JUDGE WEBBER DATED 1-3-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-25-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO COMPLY W/12/9 ORD OR OTSC WHY APPNTMNT SHLD NOT BE VACATED. PANELRO SCDATE 122988 SCHPRD ANSA
01/25/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT PER 12/9/88 & 1/18/89 COURT'S ORDER GT PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD ANSA
02/13/1989RECEIVED RESPONSE OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO MOTION TO DISMISS MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1989RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT REQUESTING STATUS OF CASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989LETTER RESPONDED RE STATUS OF APPEAL. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989LETTER FROM THOMAS DOEFEL RE STATUS OF APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/26/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/26/1989ORDER GRANTING APLE'S MOTION & DSMG APPEAL AS MOOT. SEE COSGROVE V. THORNBURGH (SEE NOTE 7) FVH PANELNWBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/26/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
01/19/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD