judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYRONE PITTMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0902
Short Caption:TYRONE PITTMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5941-87Filed Date:07/08/1988

Opening Event Date:07/08/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/06/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/17/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/22/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/15/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Steven Weinberg YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
J. Herbie Difonzo NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Glenn F. IveyYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PITTMAN, TYRONE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ARDIE DORSEY, JR. & NOTE - 01 STEVE G. ARMSTRONG NOTE - 02 2/19/91 ORD: GRT APLT'S REQ. NOTE - 02 FOR APPTMT OF COUNSEL AND NOTE - 03 J. HERBIE DIFONZO, ESQ., IS NOTE - 03 HEREBY APPTD AS COUNSEL TO NOTE - 04 REPRESENT APLT ON THIS APPEAL. NOTE - 04 FO THAT NEWLY-APPTD COUNSEL NOTE - 05 SHALL FILE A PET FOR REH/REH NOTE - 05 EN BANC W/I 30 DAYS. NOTE - 06 5/31/91 ORD: GRANT PETITION NOTE - 06 FOR REHEARING; REMAND CASE TO NOTE - 07 THE TRIAL COURT FOR NOTE - 07 RESENTENCING WITH DIRECTIONS NOTE - 08 TO VACATE APLT'S CONVICTION NOTE - 08 FOR ARMED ROBBERY; AND THAT IN NOTE - 09 ALL OTHER RESPECTS APLT'S NOTE - 09 CONVICTIONS ARE AFFIRMED FOR NOTE - 10 THE REASONS STATED IN THIS NOTE - 10 COURT'S MOJ DATED 1/25/91.
07/08/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/03/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD DSA
09/27/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 090788 SCHPRD R
10/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(104 PGS/WHALEN) AD PANEL SCDATE 103088 SCHPRD RT
11/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (571 PGS/LEWIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD RT
11/23/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (81 PGS RT - VAN BREMAN) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (9 PGS RT - JOYNER) GT PANEL SCDATE 120188 SCHPRD RT
01/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(17 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1989RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 4/8/88 PROC FROM RPTR VAN BREMEN PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1989RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 4/8/88 PROC. FROM RPTR JACKSON PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990FiledRecord Completed
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6(20 PGS/JACKSON) AD PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD RT
04/09/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 21, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 052190 SCHPRD BA
05/31/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/21/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 052390 SCHPRD B
06/25/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 062190 SCHPRD BA
06/25/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO FL LODGED BA & LODGED BA IS FILED; F/O THAT BE DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELFF SCDATE 071290 SCHPRD B
08/17/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/17/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 081790 SCHPRD BE
01/22/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/22/1991SUBMITTED PANELSTSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENTS OF CONVICTION PANELSTSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE SEE REHEARING ORD DTD 5/31/91
02/08/1991RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER REQ. APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, ETC. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) J. HERBIE DiFONZO, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 5 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1991MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC FOR 30 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 032191 SCHPRD MRRB
03/22/1991ORDER APLT'S MOT X TM FL PET FOR R/R EB IS GRNTD & TO BE FLD ON OR BEFORE 4/19/91 CKT PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/07/1991MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC OF APLT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/07/1991RECEIVED PETITION FOR REHEARING OF APLT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1991APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1991ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FL PET & CLK IS DIRTD TO FILE LODGED PET FOR REHEARING SL PANELRO SCDATE 052091 SCHPRD OPE
05/31/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 6 THRU 10 SL PANELSTSCPRY SCDATE 051491 SCHPRD VS
07/05/1991RECEIVED SR #7 ORDER/ JUDGE MORRISON DATED 6/26/91 PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD