judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FRANK E. WESLEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0828
Short Caption:FRANK E. WESLEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5484-86Filed Date:06/30/1988

Opening Event Date:06/30/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/06/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/21/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFrank E. Wesley NPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WESLEY, FRANK E. UNITED STATES
06/30/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/06/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/06/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 082988 SCHPRD R
10/12/1988ORDER DENY F/P MO OF APLT W/OUT PREJ TO ITS RENEWAL IN 20 DAYS W/ FULLY COMPLETED AFFIDAVIT. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD CHECK
11/29/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/29/1988ORDER DISMISSING CASE. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 111788 SCHPRD Q
11/29/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
12/21/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD