judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES R. HONESTY-BEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0827
Short Caption:CHARLES R. HONESTY-BEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12899-87Filed Date:06/24/1988

Opening Event Date:06/24/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/06/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/07/1990
Argued/Submitted:05/15/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/14/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles R. Honesty-Bey N
John T. Fowler YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sherri L. Evans YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HONESTY-BEY, CHARLES R. A/K/A GREAT CHARLES RUSSELL UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: JOHNNY PARSON NOTE - 01
06/24/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/19/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN T. FOWLER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1988ORDER APLT'S DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD DSA
08/31/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (165 PGS KACZOROWSKI) AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 082388 SCHPRD R
09/06/1988ORDER COUNSEL IN 10 DAYS FL DSA OR APMT VACATED & REFERRED TO BD ON PROFESSIONAL RESP. PB PANELPY SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD DSA
09/16/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 091688 SCHPRD DSA
07/06/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(94 PGS/MITCHELL) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
09/22/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR REFERRED TO BPR. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081589 SCHPRD BA
10/02/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO SEPTEMBER 22ND ORDER & TO EXTEND FOR 40 DAYS TO FILE BRIEF (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD ANSA
10/13/1989ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE BY 11/12/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD X
11/16/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RG PANEL SCDATE 111289 SCHPRD BA
12/14/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-16-90 NO OPPO ADD PANEL SCDATE 121489 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF TO 1/16/90. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 121589 SCHPRD V
01/17/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 17, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 011690 SCHPRD BE
01/17/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1990FiledBriefing Completed
02/07/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 020190 SCHPRD V
05/15/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/15/1990SUBMITTED RJG PANELROFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELROFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/14/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD