judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FARMERS INS. EXCH. VS. DIST. CT. (MCLEOD)

Case Information: 40905
Short Caption:FARMERS INS. EXCH. VS. DIST. CT. (MCLEOD)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A437927Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/18/2003 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:12/18/2003How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/10/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lewis & Roca--check no. 402520.
02/10/2003Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 03-02282
03/31/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 03-05348
04/10/2003MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Petitioners Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. And Susan Bithell's Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings. 03-06046
04/28/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Denying Motion for Stay. In determining whether to grant a stay pending disposition of a writ petition, this court generally considers four factors. Petitioners have not demonstrated that these factors militate in favor of a stay. We deny petitioners' motion. 03-07190
05/05/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Real Parties in Interest, Randy McLeod, Et Al., Emergency Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File an Answer to Farmers' Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 03-07545
05/07/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed May 5, 2003. The real parties in interest shall have until May 19, 2003, to file and serve their answer. 03-07730
05/16/2003Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer of Real Parties in Interest, Randy McLeod, et al., to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 03-08354
05/30/2003MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Petitioners Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. and Susan Bithell's Motion for Leave toFile a Reply in Support of their Petition for a Writ of Mandmaus. 03-09038
06/02/2003MotionFiled Response to Motion. Real Parties in Interest, Randy McLeod, Et Al.'s Opposition to Petitioners Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of their Petition for a Writ of Mandamus. 03-09143
06/20/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to File Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Petitioners moved to file a reply in support of their petition. The real parties in interest opposed the motion. We grant the motion and direct the clerk of this court to file the reply received from petitioners on May 30, 2003. 03-10300
06/20/2003MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 03-09039
10/15/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on December 18, 2003, at 9:00 a.m. (SNP04-RR/ML/WM)
11/24/2003Other Other. Received Supplement to Answer of Real Parties in Interest, Randy McLeod, et al., to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 03-19622
11/26/2003MotionFiled Motion. Real Parties in Interest, Randy McLeod, et. al.'s Motion for Leave to file a Supplemental Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 03-19785
12/04/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
12/05/2003MotionFiled Response to Motion. Petitioners' Opposition to the Real Parties in Interest's Motion for Leave to File a Supplement to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 03-20253
12/09/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed November 26, 2003. The clerk shall file the supplement received on November 24, 2003. 03-20432
12/09/2003Other Other. Supplement to Answer of Real Parties in Interest, Randy McLeod, et al., to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 03-19622
12/09/2003MotionFiled Motion. Real Party in Interest, Randy McLeod, et.al.'s Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File a Supplement to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 03-20504
12/10/2003Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Copy of order filed in district court on November 20, 2003. 03-20582
12/10/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: November 25, 20003 (not certified). 03-20583
12/12/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. as Moot. The real parties in interest have filed a motion for leave to file a reply to petitioners' opposition to the real parties in interest's motion to file a supplemental answer. Because this court has already granted the real parties in interest's motion to file a supplemental answer, the motion to file a reply is denied as moot. 03-20698
12/17/2003MotionFiled Motion. Petitioners Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. and Susan Bithell's Motion for Court to Take Judicial Notice. 03-21014
12/18/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP04-RR/ML/WM
01/09/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 17, 2003. Petitioners have moved this court to take judicial notice of the 'Minutes of the Meeting of the Assembly Committee on Government Affairs, dated February 13, 2003, and the Minutes of the Meeting of the Assembly Committee on Government Affairs, dated April 4, 2003.' This court will take judicial notice of the above documents when taking this matter under consideration. 04-00555
01/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This matter was submitted for decision following oral argument on December 18, 2003. The oral argument was held before a panel of this court comprised of Justices Rose, Leavitt, and Maupin. Justice Leavitt having died in office on January 9, 2004, Chief Justice Shearing will participate in the decision of this matter in Justice Leavitt's place on the recording of the oral argument and the papers filed herein. 04-01290
02/11/2004MotionFiled Motion. Real Parties in Interest, Randy McLeod, et al.'s Motion for Leave to File Second Supplement to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 04-02721
02/24/2004MotionFiled Response to Motion. Petitioners' Opposition of the Real Parties in Interest's Motion for Leave to file a Second Supplement to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 04-03521
03/12/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 17, 2003, petitioners moved this court to take judicial notice of 2 documents. On January 9, 2004, this court entered an order granting petitioners' motion. Later that same day, the real parties in interest submitted an untimely opposition to petitioners' motion. Because this court granted petitioners' motion and because the real parties in interest did not request an extension of time to file the opposition, this court will take no action with regard to the opposition. The clerk shall return, unfiled, the opposition received on January 9, 2004. The real parties in interest have moved to file a second supplement to their answer to the petition for a writ of mandamus. Petitioners oppose the motion. No good cause appearing, we deny the motion. 04-04676
03/12/2004Other Returned Unfiled Document. Real Parties in Interest, Randy McLeod, Et Al.'s, Opposition to Petitioners Motion for Court to Take Judicial Notice.
04/07/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus in Part and Denying in Part. "ORDER the petition GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to grant Farmers' motion for summary judgment with respect to the class members' statutory claim." SNP04S-MS/RR/WM 04-06375
04/07/2004WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Jason M. Kerr for service upon Judge Lee A. Gates. 04-06397
04/16/2004WritFiled Writ. 04-06397
04/21/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certiciate of Service on District Judge Lee A. Gates. 04-07374
05/04/2004RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 04-07086
05/04/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.