judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WINFORD W. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0846
Short Caption:WINFORD W. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10566-87Filed Date:07/05/1988

Opening Event Date:07/05/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/21/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/19/1989
Argued/Submitted:03/13/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/11/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliams, Winford W.N
Thomas Reed Kennedy YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Karen E. Rhew YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, WINFORD W. UNITED STATES
07/05/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/20/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS R. KENNEDY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD DSA
09/21/1988FiledRecord Completed
09/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD R
06/07/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(209 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-16-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD BA
08/14/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/16/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080189 SCHPRD N
08/16/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 15TH (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 081679 SCHPRD BA
08/31/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR EXT OF TIME TO 9/15/89. ANY FUR REQ FOR AN EXT WILL BE DISFAVORED. PB PANELDDW SCDATE 081789 SCHPRD V
09/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 19, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 091589 SCHPRD BA
09/19/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT & BRF OF APLT IS FL; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 092789 SCHPRD OPE
10/19/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/19/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD BE
03/13/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/13/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGTEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGTEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/11/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD