judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARTIN O. DEVORE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0900
Short Caption:MARTIN O. DEVORE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8152-87Filed Date:07/08/1988

Opening Event Date:07/08/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/14/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMartin O. Devore N
Wendell C. RobinsonNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DEVORE, MARTIN O. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: DWAIN W. LYNCH NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 SEE 88-779 NOTE - 02
07/08/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/22/1988RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1988RECEIVED SR #1(392 PGS/BRADLEY) (13 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE SRT, DSA & FEE OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD DSA
10/05/1988$50.00 DOCKETING FEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (392 PGS BRADLEY - 13 PGS BURNS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1988$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 101088 SCHPRD DSA
11/04/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(39 PGS/LEWIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1989ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 10 DAYS OR DISMISS. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 121488 SCHPRD BA
01/31/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/28/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD BA
03/06/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO TO EXT THE TIME TO FL BRF IN 5 DAYS OR DISMISS APPEAL. PB PANELRO SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD Q
03/24/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/24/1989ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE APPELLANT'S BRIEF FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
03/27/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) OF (WENDELL C. ROBINSON) AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD