Case Information: 40915 | |||
Short Caption: | HORNER (CLAUDE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR4090 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/10/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/10/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 03-02350 | |
02/12/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: November 1, 2002. Court Reporter: Sheldon L. Hensley. Not filed in district court. | 03-02453 | |
02/28/2003 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: November 1, 2002. Court Reporter: Sheldon Hensley. | 03-03348 | |
03/13/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 03-04264 | |
03/13/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 03-04265 | |
04/09/2003 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: April 9, 2003. | 03-05916 | |
04/10/2003 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation for Enlargement of Time to File State's Fast Track Response and Appendix. | 03-06056 | |
05/06/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Stipulation Approved. The State shall have to and including May 12, 2003, to file and serve the fast track response and any appendix. | 03-07716 | |
05/09/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. and Appendix. | 03-07947 | |
06/11/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 03-09725 | |
06/25/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. All stipulations and motions for extensions of time to file the fast track response are hereby denied. The State shall have 10 days form the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed on counsel for the State. | 03-10623 | |
06/26/2003 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. (fast track response) | 03-10727 | |
07/21/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Stipulation Approved. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track response provisionally submitted on July 7, 2003. | 03-12223 | |
07/21/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 03-11334 | |
10/20/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP04-RR/ML/WM | 03-17388 | |
10/30/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Publication of Order. | 03-18153 | |
11/14/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-17569 | |
11/14/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/04/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 19, 2003. | 03-17569 | |
04/06/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. for Publication. Respondent State of Nevada has filed a motion requesting that this court publish its decision in this matter as an opinion. After considering the motion, we conclude that publicatin is not warranted. We deny respondent's motion. fn1[This appeal was resolved by a three-justice panel that included the Honorable Myron E. Leavitt, Justice. Because Justice Leavitt passed away in office on January 9, 2004, this motion has been decided by the remaining justices on that panel.] | 04-06309 |