judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AFNAN J. PARKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0899
Short Caption:AFNAN J. PARKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8902-87Filed Date:06/14/1988

Opening Event Date:06/14/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/01/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAfnan J. Parker N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PARKER, AFNAN J. UNITED STATES
06/14/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/02/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 081288 SCHPRD DSA
08/03/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE TRANSCRIPT ORDERED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RT(442 PGS/SWAGERTY) AD PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD R
11/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 22, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 112288 SCHPRD BA
12/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 122288 SCHPRD BA
01/10/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
01/10/1989ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELRO SCDATE 010489 SCHPRD V
01/10/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
02/01/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD