Case Information: 46712 | |||
Short Caption: | NAPIER VS. NAPIER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D095914 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/07/2006 / Trost, Janet | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/01/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 fromStanley W. Pierce--check no. 37269. | ||
02/01/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 06-02370 | |
02/07/2006 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/16/2006 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 06-03500 | |
02/21/2006 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of docketing statement on settlement judge Trost. | 06-03783 | |
03/06/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 06-04864 | |
03/06/2006 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 06-04865 | |
03/09/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 06-05187 | |
03/09/2006 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |